Nguyen, Gia Khanh (CPSO#: 44519)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saigon, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Dec 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1988