Nguyen, Lau Kim (CPSO#: 72445)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2001