Nguyen, Melody Hong Hanh (CPSO#: 82960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
3477 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1V 3Z7
Phone: (416) 335-9700
Fax: (416) 335-9800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue North
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-4069
Fax: (416) 480-6885
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melody Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nguyen ( CPSO# 82960 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
3477 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z7
Phone Number: (416) 335-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 08 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELODY HONG HANH NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012