Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nguyen, Ngoc Truong Tieu (CPSO#: 70535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Montreal, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Extendicare Nursing Home - Oshawa
82 Park Road North
Oshawa ON  L1J 4L1
Phone: (905) 579-0011
Fax: (905) 579-1733
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnycrest Nursing Home
1635 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-0111 Ext. 223
Fax: (905) 576-4721
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Wynfield LTC Residence
451 Woodmount Drive
Oshawa ON  L1G 8E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 571-0065 Ext. 500
Fax: (905) 579-3256
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ngoc Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nguyen ( CPSO# 70535 )

Business Address:
Sunnycrest Nursing Home
1635 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2K9
Phone Number: (905) 576-0111

Business Address:
451 Woodmount Drive
Oshawa ON  L1G 8E3
Phone Number: (905) 571-0065

Business Address:
Extendicare Nursing Home
82 Park Road North
Oshawa ON  L1J 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 579-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NGOC TRUONG TIEU NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996