Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nguyen, Patricia My-Lan (CPSO#: 56560)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 15 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Sep 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014