Nguyen, Quang Van Ky (CPSO#: 82460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish, Vietnamese

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone: (416) 324-4100
Fax: (416) 324-4262
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Q. Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Nguyen ( CPSO# 82460 )

Business Address:
Sherbourne Health Centre
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QUANG VAN KY NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009