Nguyen, Thao Elsie (CPSO#: 75063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital UHN
Department of Medical Imaging
585 University Avenue
Room 1-295, Munk Building
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3291
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Elsie Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen ( CPSO# 75063 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital UHN
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 295 1st Floor Munk Building
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THAO ELSIE NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2007