Nguyen, Tram Anh Thi (CPSO#: 79770)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Medical and Pharmaceutical University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 102
1280 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 3K6
Phone: (416) 398-3738
Fax: (416) 398-3733
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tram Anh Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79770 )

Business Address:
Unit 102
1280 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 3K6
Phone Number: (416) 398-3738

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRAM ANH THI NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2006