Nguyen, Truong Van (CPSO#: 70676)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:University of Saigon, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 122
1315 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3J 2G6
Phone: (416) 398-0307
Fax: (416) 398-0905
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jan 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRUONG VAN NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 25, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)