Nguyen, Tung Duc (CPSO#: 71636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Vietnamese

Education:Universite de Hue, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
428 East Broadway
Vancouver BC  V5T 1X2
Phone: (604) 709-0100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUNG DUC NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Oct 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000