Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nguyen, Tuyet Thi (CPSO#: 54300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Montreal, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-7575
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florian Braig and Dr. Tuyet Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Nguyen ( CPSO# 54300 )
Dr. F. Braig ( CPSO# 50195 )

Business Address:
Suite 57
470 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1G1
Phone Number: (613) 966-4045

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TUYET THI NGUYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NGUYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2010