Nguyen-Tri, Isabelle (CPSO#: 104746)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Laval University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2015