Niakosari, Firouzeh (CPSO#: 80238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview North Dermatology Clinic
Suite 205
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 222-7546
Fax: (416) 221-7546
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Niakosari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Niakosari ( CPSO# 80238 )

Business Address:
205 - 3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 222-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 31 Aug 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIROUZEH NIAKOSARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAKOSARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 24 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 25 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Sep 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 18 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
International Specialist Physician - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Dec 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007