Niamatali, Gordon Ramzan (CPSO#: 27969)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 11 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997