Nianiaris, Nicholas (CPSO#: 59720)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: (416) 462-3612
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TLC Laser Eye Centre
Suite 212
2345 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3J6
Canada
Phone: (416) 733-2020
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Nianiaris Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nianiaris ( CPSO# 59720 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 462-0393

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
TLC Laser Eye Centers (Toronto)
Suite 212
2345 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 733-2020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS NIANIARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIANIARIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989