Niaz, Ayyan (CPSO#: 69194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 109
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 607-6398
Fax: (905) 607-8293
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ayyan Niaz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Niaz ( CPSO# 69194 )

Business Address:
Suite 109
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 607-6398

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AYYAN NIAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIAZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2007