Nichol, Alan McVey (CPSO#: 78617)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jul 1995 CFPC Specialist
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Oct 2002 to 08 Nov 2002
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2004