Nichol, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 23967)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 1996