Nicholas, Cynthia Susan (CPSO#: 33543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203-10168 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T6
Phone: (905) 884-6119
Fax: (905) 884-0528
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nicholas ( CPSO# 33543 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
10168 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1T6
Phone Number: (905) 884-6119

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
330 Highway 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA SUSAN NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1982