Nicholas, Everton Sylvester (CPSO#: 61161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 463-6280
Fax: (416) 463-9480
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

103-9506 Markham Rd
Markham ON  L6E 1O7
Phone: 905-209-1142
Fax: 905-209-1150
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Everton S. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2013

Dr. E. Nicholas ( CPSO# 61161 )

Business Address:
Suite 214
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 463-6280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 08 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. EVERTON SYLVESTER NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990