Nichols, Bruce David (CPSO#: 33187)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ivey Eye Institute
St Joseph's Health Centre
P O Box 5777
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6369
Fax: (519) 646-6108
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Laser Center
R40 - 142 Fullarton Street
London ON  N6A 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 438-2020
Fax: (519) 438-2021
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bruce Nichols Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nichols ( CPSO# 33187 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
Ivey Eye Institute
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6369

Business Address:
Suite R40
142 Fullarton Street
London ON  N6A 5B5
Phone Number: (877) 852-2020

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Minnesota
USA - Utah

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUCE DAVID NICHOLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987