Nichols, Dorin (CPSO#: 65630)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2013