Nichols, Melinda (CPSO#: 63370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1994 to 28 Feb 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 2010