Nichols, Robert Bertram (CPSO#: 88622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 213
99 Kakulu Road
Kanata ON  K2L 3C8
Phone: (613) 592-2204
Fax: (613) 592-0846
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Queensway Carleton Hospital
Department of Geriatrics
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Nichols Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nichols ( CPSO# 88622 )

Business Address:
Suite 213
99 Kakulu Road
Ottawa ON  K2L 3C8
Phone Number: (613) 592-2204

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BERTRAM NICHOLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012