Nicholson, Adam David (CPSO#: 93550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-4710
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nicholson ( CPSO# 93550 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-4710

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 15 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM DAVID NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2013