Nicholson, Jennifer Margaret (CPSO#: 78556)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARGARET NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 22 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2003 to 22 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2004 to 22 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2005 to 22 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2017