Nicholson, Naomi Louise (CPSO#: 89482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 880-0501
Fax: (705) 880-0505
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Dermatology
775 Monoghan Rd South
Peterborough ON  K9J5K2
Canada
Phone: 7057757546
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Stuart Bothwell & Naomi Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bothwell ( CPSO# 89085 )
Dr. N. Nicholson ( CPSO# 89482 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
208 - 189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 880-0501

Business Address:
Centre for Dermatology
775 Monoghan Road South
Peterborough ON  K9J 5K2
Phone Number: (705) 775-7546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAOMI LOUISE NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010