Nicholson, Roger Gough (CPSO#: 25078)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: File created prior to June 2006 are being stored by: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com For files created after June 2006, patients can write to: 1154 Westhaven Drive Burlington, ON L7P 5B3
Date Received: 29 May 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012