Nickell, Leslie Anne (CPSO#: 60944)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
1 Bridgepoint Dr
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leslie Nickell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nickell ( CPSO# 60944 )

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Active Health Care
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ANNE NICKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICKELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1990