Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nicol, Olu Kayode Louis Victor (CPSO#: 56525)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of London, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 223 Lakeshore Road Mississauga ON L6H 1G5
Date Received: 09 Aug 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Trinidad and Tobago

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 12 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 12 Dec 2014
Summary:

 On December 12, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nicol committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession in his care and treatment of 26 patients. Dr. Nicol admitted to the allegation. 
  
 Regarding a complaint received in July 2011 regarding the care of Patient A, Dr. X, an 
 independent assessor retained by the College, opined that Dr. Nicol failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of a general practitioner: in the manner in which he prescribed narcotics to 
 Patient A; in dealing with her underlying substance abuse problem and mood disorder; and, in 
 the overall care of Patient A, including in the absences of history taking and physical exam as 
 well as failing to ensure that proper screening protocols were undertaken, such as a PAP test, 
 colon cancer screening and diabetes screening.   
  
 In July 2012, the College commenced a broader investigation into Dr. Nicol’s practice and 
 retained Dr. Y, an independent assessor, to opine on Dr. Nicol’s care and treatment of 25 
 patients. Dr. Y opined that Dr. Nicol’s record-keeping failed to maintain the standard of practice 
of medicine in each case. He also opined that Dr. Nicol’s overall care of multiple patients failed 
to maintain the standard of practice including: 
•  He failed to acknowledge test results or follow up on some results; 
•  He appeared hesitant in making the diagnosis of diabetes when the diagnostic criteria were 
   met and seemed hesitant to manage these patients in an effective manner; 
•  With respect to pain management, he started patients on high-doses of narcotics and, in some 
   cases, mixed varieties, without employing a slower, more cautious approach to the initiation 
   of therapy. Initial screening steps and a clearer recording of functional abilities was lacking.  
   He did not consider drug interactions in his prescribing of medications; 
•  He was not diligent in minimizing the use of benzodiazepines; 
•  Being inconsistent in his lipid assessment and management;  
 • He needlessly treated what seemed to be viral respiratory infections with antibiotics; 
 • He displayed some lack of knowledge in the area of vaccines; and 
 • He displayed a lack of knowledge with respect to screening recommendations for 
   mammography, PAP smears, colorectal screening and has not kept up to date with current 
   concepts in osteoporosis. 
 
In January 2014, Dr. Nicol entered into an undertaking with the College pending the disposition 
 of the discipline hearing. In accordance with the undertaking, Dr. Nicol has practiced under 
 supervision. The College has received regular reports from Dr. Nicol’s supervisor which indicate 
 improvements in Dr. Nicol’s practice. Some improvements in Dr. Nicol’s practice were also 
 noted by Dr. Y. 
  
 The Committee ordered and directed that: 
 •  the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Nicol’s certificate 
    of registration: 
 (a)   Dr. Nicol shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the 
       following substances: 
          (i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
             Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
          (ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the 
       Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
    (iii)Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs 
       Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);  
    (iv) Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and 
       Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and 
       Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
              
       (collectively referred to as the “Restricted Substances”) 
     
 (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of 
 Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule “A”; and the current 
 regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule “B”)   
  
    (v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotic Safety and Awareness 
       Act, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule “C”) and as amended from time to 
       time; 

(b)    Dr. Nicol shall not take on any new chronic pain patients; 
(c)   Dr. Nicol shall refer patients who are diabetic or who have impaired glucose 
      tolerance to a specialty clinic for assessment and treatment recommendations; 
(d)   Dr. Nicol shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room in the form set out at 
      Schedule “D”;  
(e)   Dr. Nicol shall, within 30 days from the date of this Order, retain a College-
      approved clinical preceptor, who will sign an undertaking in the form attached 
      hereto as Schedule “E” (the “Clinical Preceptor”). For a period of twelve (12) 
      months commencing on the day the Clinical Preceptor is retained, Dr. Nicol may 
      practice only under the supervision of the Clinical Preceptor and will abide at his 
      own expense by all recommendations of his Clinical Preceptor with respect to his 
      practice; 
(f)   If Dr. Nicol is unable to obtain a Clinical Preceptor on the terms set out under 1(e) 
      above, he shall cease practicing medicine until such time as he has obtained a 
      Clinical Preceptor acceptable to the College.  If he required to cease practice as a 
      result of this paragraph, this will constitute a term, condition and limitation on his 
      Certificate of Registration and such term, condition and limitation shall be 
      included on the public register; 
(g)   For a period of twelve (12) months, Dr. Nicol may practice only with a College- 
      appointed clinical supervisor, who will sign an undertaking in the form attached 
      hereto as Schedule “F”; 
(h)   Upon completion of this twelve (12) month period, as described in paragraphs 
      1(e) and 1(g), within three (3) months, Dr. Nicol shall undergo a re-assessment of 
      his clinical practice by a College-appointed Assessor.  This re-assessment by the 
      Assessor will include a review of Dr. Nicol’s office charts and an interview with 
      Dr. Nicol.  Dr. Nicol shall abide by all recommendations made by the College-
      appointed Assessor.  The Assessor shall report the results of this re-assessment to 
      the College; 
(i)   Two years after the completion of the re-assessment referred to above in 
      paragraph 1(h), Dr. Nicol shall undergo a further re-assessment of his clinical 
           practice by a College- appointed assessor, in addition to the re-assessment referred 
           to in paragraph 1(h) above and, regardless of that re-assessor’s recommendations.  
           Dr. Nicol shall abide by all recommendations made by the College-appointed 
           assessor.  The assessor shall report the results of this re-assessment to the College; 
     (j)   On an annual basis, Dr. Nicol shall meet and demonstrate to the College that he 
           has met the annual continuing medical education requirements expected of 
           members of the College of Family Physicians of Canada;  
     (k)   Dr. Nicol shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with implementing 
           the terms of this Order;  
     (l)   Dr. Nicol shall consent to the sharing of information between the Preceptors, 
           Supervisors, Assessor(s) and the College as any of them deem necessary or 
           desirable in order to fulfill their respective obligation; and 
     (m)   Dr. Nicol shall co-operate with unannounced inspections of his office practice and 
           patient charts by the College for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his 
           compliance with the terms of this Order and shall provide his irrevocable consent 
           to the College to make appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, 
           the Narcotic Monitoring Database and/or any person or institution who may have 
           relevant information for the purposes of monitoring and enforcing his compliance 
           with the terms of this Order. 

•  Dr. Nicol appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
•  Dr. Nicol pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00 by January 12, 2015. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 12, 2014


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Oct 2007
Summary:

On October 1, 2007, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Olu Kayode Louis Victor Nicol committed professional misconduct in 
that he failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession.  The Discipline Committee 
ordered the following: 
 
1)         That Dr. Nicol attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
reprimand   to be recorded on the register; 
 
2)         Direct the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
      Nicol s certificate of registration: 
 
  
a) shall practice under the supervision and monitoring of Dr. X (or such other monitor as the 
parties may agree to), in accordance with the provisions of the Undertaking dated August 16, 
2006, attached to the original Order as Schedule A ; 
 
b)      Dr. Nicol shall participate in a program of professional education and mentoring with Dr. 
Y. (or such other monitor as the parties may agree to) in accordance with the provisions of the 
Undertaking dated August 16, 2006, attached to the original Order as Schedule A ; 
 
 c)      The terms, conditions and limitations outlined at paragraphs 2a and 2b above shall 
continue in effect until such time as Dr. Nicol completes, at his own expense, a Physician 
Review Program ( PREP ) assessment, at which time Dr. Nicol shall abide by all of the 
recommendations made as a result of the assessment, subject to any pre-existing right of appeal.   
The terms, conditions and limitations outlined above at paragraphs 2a and 2b shall continue in 
effect pending the exhaustion of any such pre-existing right of appeal; 
 
d)      Dr. Nicol is required to successfully complete, at his own expense, the College s 
Medical Record-Keeping for Physicians  course, at the earliest available date, and to provide 
proof that he has done so to the College; and 
 
e)      Dr. Nicol is required to successfully complete, at his own expense, the College s 
Medical Ethics and Informed Consent  course, at the earliest available date, and to provide 
proof that he has done so to the College.  
 
3)         The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in 
      the    register. 
 
  
 
  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 01, 2007