Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nicol, Philip Dunbar (CPSO#: 51277)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2010