Nicolaou, Georghios (CPSO#: 71773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia and
Perioperative Medicine
2nd Floor Room D2-309
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8300 Ext. 55115
Fax: (519) 685-8275
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Georghios Nicolaou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nicolaou ( CPSO# 71773 )

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
Operating Room
London ON  N6G 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8300

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Operating Room
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8525

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
Operating Room
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGHIOS NICOLAOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLAOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1997