Nicolas, Valerie Gisele Andree (CPSO#: 88153)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: Le Foll, Valerie Gisele Andree (used until: 14 Sep 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: French

Education:Universite De Nantes, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 2008 to 02 Jun 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2008 to 28 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 24 Nov 2010
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Nov 2010