Nicoletti, Bruno Silvio (CPSO#: 76242)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bruno Nicoletti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nicoletti ( CPSO# 76242 )

Business Address:
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2J 5V7
Phone Number: (613) 258-8710

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRUNO SILVIO NICOLETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLETTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003