Nicolle, Michael Wade (CPSO#: 55575)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Dept. of CNS - University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3236
Fax: (519) 663-3328
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Nicolle, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nicolle ( CPSO# 55575 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Clinical Neurological Sciences
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3236

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 29 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WADE NICOLLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jun 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1986