Nicora Villamayor, Marcelo Amancio (CPSO#: 108365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 05 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National Asuncion University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
McL 2-405
399 Bathurs Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCELO AMANCIO NICORA VILLAMAYOR may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. NICORA VILLAMAYOR is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. NICORA VILLAMAYOR shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NICORA VILLAMAYOR is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NICORA VILLAMAYOR shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. NICORA VILLAMAYOR ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. NICORA VILLAMAYOR ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 04 Feb 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018