Nie, Robert Graham (CPSO#: 71121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone: (705) 743-6760 Ext. 2
Fax: (705) 743-1113
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Nie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nie ( CPSO# 71121 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Suite 303
270 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 2V4
Phone Number: (705) 743-6760

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT GRAHAM NIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002