Niec, Anne Christine (CPSO#: 55853)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pediatrics
Children's Hospital
McMaster University
1200 Main Street West, Room 3N10
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73687
Fax: (905) 522-7982
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Niec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Niec ( CPSO# 55853 )

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
Children's Hospital
McMaster University
3N10 - 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE CHRISTINE NIEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1988