Niedoba, Joseph Edward (CPSO#: 30079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1978

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208-170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8
Phone: (905) 857-2356
Fax: (905) 857-6253
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kristus Darzs
11290 Pine Vallet Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 832-3300
Fax: (905) 832-2029
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Davis Centre
80 Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 857-0975
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Husky Injection Molding Systems
500 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 5S5
Canada
Phone: (905) 951-5000 Ext. 2258
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

King Nursing Home
49 Sterne Street
Bolton ON  L7E 1B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 857-4117
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Malton Village
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 791-1179
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Niedoba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Niedoba ( CPSO# 30079 )

Business Address:
Bolton Walk In Clinic
208 - 170 McEwan Drive East
Bolton ON  L7E 4C8

Business Address:
11290 Pine Valley Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1A6

Business Address:
Davis Centre
80 Allan Drive
Bolton ON  L7E 1P7
Phone Number: (905) 857-0975

Business Address:
Malton Village
7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H1
Phone Number: (905) 791-1179

Business Address:
King Nusing Home
49 Sterne Street
Bolton ON  L7E 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 857-4117

Business Address:
Husky Injection Molding Systems
500 Queen Street South
Bolton ON  L7E 5S5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH EDWARD NIEDOBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEDOBA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1978

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: September 15, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)