Nield, Antony Stewart (CPSO#: 55831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Feb 2005

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thistlewood Professional Centre
Suite 301
8077 Islington Avenue North
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 851-1449
Fax: (905) 264-8847
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nield & Nield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nield ( CPSO# 55831 )
Dr. G. Nield ( CPSO# 54283 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
8077 Islington Avenue North
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 851-1449

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Feb 2005

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Feb 2005 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 18, 2005, Dr. Antony Stewart Nield undertakes to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

                  1.    Dr. Nield will stop practising primary care medicine and will limit
                        his office-based practice to wart removal and laser hair removal
                        treatments, effective March 31, 2005; and
                  
                  2.    Provide at least three months' written notice to the Quality
                        Assurance Committee of the College if he wishes to resume primary
                        care practice; and
                  
                  3.    Comply with all assessment, review and enhancement activities
                        directed by the Quality Assurance Committee before resuming primary
                        care practice.