Nield, Gail Louise (CPSO#: 54283)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 1987

Summary

Former Name: Cunningham, Gail Louise (used until: 28 May 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
8077 Islington Avenue North
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 851-1436
Fax: (905) 264-8847
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nield & Nield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nield ( CPSO# 55831 )
Dr. G. Nield ( CPSO# 54283 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
8077 Islington Avenue North
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 851-1449

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 16 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAIL LOUISE NIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIELD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 1987