Nield, Lynne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6140
Fax: (416) 813-7547
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miner and Nield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Miner ( CPSO# 66789 )
Dr. L. Nield ( CPSO# 71563 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
641 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 898-5800

Business Address:
Division of Cardiology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6141

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNNE ELIZABETH NIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998