Nielsen, Adam Brent (CPSO#: 104942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University Of Antigua, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
510 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P5
Phone: (613) 433-5712
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM BRENT NIELSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIELSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2014 to 12 Jan 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2017