Nielsen, Devin Ryan (CPSO#: 72210)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devin R. Nielsen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 7 2005

Medical Records Location

Address: Perth Smiths Falls District Hospital 33 Drummond St W Perth, ON K7H 2K1
Date Received: 02 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Nunavut
Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 03 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2017