Niesner, Claudia Cipriana Florina (CPSO#: 89960)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Park Medical Clinics
Suite 300
140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: (519) 850-3234
Fax: (519) 850-3238
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Claudia Niesner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Niesner ( CPSO# 89960 )

Business Address:
Health Park Medical Clinics
300 - 140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone Number: (519) 850-3234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA CIPRIANA FLORINA NIESNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIESNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2010