Niesobska, Violetta (CPSO#: 60904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctors Office
Suite 387
25 Peel Centre Drive
Brampton ON  L6T 3R5
Phone: (905) 793-7077
Fax: (905) 793-7506
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIOLETTA NIESOBSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIESOBSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990