Niessen, Marcus Paul (CPSO#: 63749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 254-2676
Fax: (519) 254-2659
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Niessen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Niessen ( CPSO# 63749 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 254-2676

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Aug 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARCUS PAUL NIESSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIESSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1992