Nietmann, Henrique (CPSO#: 94737)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Centro Universitario Serra dos Orgao, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 07 Mar 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011