Nieto, Alvaro (CPSO#: 18542)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1960
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2000