Nigam, Srishti (CPSO#: 23481)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Lucknow, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1962
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1963
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992